Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1137
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1137
Title:Tennessee, By and Through the Tennessee General Assembly, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of State, et al.
Docketed:March 17, 2020
Linked with 19A712
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5478)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2019Application (19A712) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2020 to March 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Application (19A712) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 16, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Waiver of right of respondents U.S. Department of State, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Immigration Studies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2020Brief amici curiae of Eagle Forum and Tennessee Eagle Forum filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 12 2020Response Requested. (Due June 11, 2020)
May 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2020 to July 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2020.
Jun 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 12, 2020.
Jul 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2020 to August 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 14, 2020.
Aug 14 2020Brief of respondents U.S. Department of State, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 17 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from September 2, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until September 16, 2020 granted.
Sep 14 2020Reply of petitioners Tennessee General Assembly, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Tennessee General Assembly, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of State, et al.
Other
Julie B. Axelrod
    Counsel of Record
Center for Immigration Studies
1629 K Street
Suite 600
Washington DC, DC 20006

jba@cis.org
7038882442
Party name: Center for Immigration Studies
Joanne Enid Bregman
    Counsel of Record
Joanne Bregman
6049 Robin Hill Road
Nashville, TN 37205

jebregman@gmail.com
615-589-9489
Party name: Eagle Forum and Tennessee Eagle Forum
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543