Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1134
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1134
Title:Lonny E. Baley, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:March 17, 2020
Linked with 19A842
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1323, 2018-1325)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 27 2020Application (19A842) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2020 to March 13, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 29 2020Application (19A842) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 13, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Middle Rio Grande Conservancy District filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Oregon Water Resources Congress, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Farm Bureau Federation and the State Farm Bureau Organizations of Arizona, California, Colorado, Idaho, Hawaii, Montana, Nevada, New Mexico, Oregon, Utah, Washington, and Wyoming filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Ronald A. Cass, David F. Forte, James L. Huffman, Donald J. Kochan, Jesse J. Richardson and Reed Watson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association of California Water Agencies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2020Brief of respondent Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen’s Associations in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
May 29 2020Reply of petitioners Lonny Baley, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Scott Simmons
    Counsel of Record
Somach Simmons and Dunn
500 Capital Mall
Suite 1000
Sacramento, CA 95814

psimmons@somachlaw.com
9164467979
Party name: Lonny Baley, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Todd D. True
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
810 Third Ave., Suite 610
Seattle, WA 98104

ttrue@earthjustice.org
206-343-7340
Party name: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen’s Associations
Other
David R. E. Aladjem
    Counsel of Record
Downey Brand LLP
621 Capitol Mall 18th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

daladjem@downeybrand.com
916.520.5361
Party name: Association of California Water Agencies
Charles T. DuMars
    Counsel of Record
Law & Resource Planning Associates, PC
201 Third Steet NW
Suite 1750
Albuquerque, NM 87102

dml@lrpa-usa.com
5053460998
Party name: The Middle Rio Grande Conservancy District
James Lloyd Huffman II
    Counsel of Record
5340 S. W. Hewett Blvd.
Portland, OR 97221

huffman@lclark.edu
5037025429
Party name: Professors Ronald A. Cass, David F. Forte, James L. Huffman, Donald J. Kochan, Jesse J. Richardson and Reed Watson
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: The American Farm Bureau Federation and the State Farm Bureau Organizations of Arizona, California, Colorado, Idaho, Hawaii, Montana, Nevada, New Mexico, Oregon, Utah, Washington, and Wyoming
Rachel Catherine Lee
    Counsel of Record
Stoel Rives LLP
760 SW Ninth Avenue, Suite 3000
Portland, OR 97205

rachel.lee@stoel.com
503-294-9403
Party name: Oregon Water Resources Congress, et al.
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543