Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1129
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1129
Title:Charles T. Fote, Petitioner
v.
Andrei Iancu, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:March 16, 2020
Linked with 19A821
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2311)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2020Application (19A821) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Application (19A821) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 11, 2020.
Mar 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Robert Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1000 Louisiana Street
Suite 4000
Houston, TX 77002

william.peterson@morganlewis.com
(713) 890-5000
Party name: Charles T. Fote
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543