Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1127
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1127
Title:Wheeler K. Neff, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 13, 2020
Linked with 19A780
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2282)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2020Application (19A780) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 3, 2020 to April 1, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Application (19A780) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 1, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020Petition DENIED.
May 15 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Byron Cogan
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Adam B. Cogan
218 West Main Street
Suite A
Ligonier, PA 15658

adamcogan@aol.com
7243315670
Party name: Wheeler Neff
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543