Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1126
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1126
Title:Stacey Mooney, Petitioner
v.
Illinois Education Association, et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1774)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2020 to May 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2020.
May 11 2020Brief of respondents Illinois Education Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 09 2020Reply of petitioner Stacey Mooney filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 23 2020Rescheduled.
Jul 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 04 2020Rescheduled.
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 14 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Stacey Mooney
Attorneys for Respondents
John Miller West
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street NW - Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jwest@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Illinois Education Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543