Jan 22 2020 | Application (19A819) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Jan 23 2020 | Application (19A819) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 9, 2020. |
| |
Mar 09 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2020) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 01 2020 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, LinkedIn Corporation |
| Blanket Consent |
Apr 13 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent hiQ Labs, Inc. to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Apr 13 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020. |
| |
Apr 23 2020 | Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2020) |
| |
May 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2020 to June 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2020. |
| |
Jun 25 2020 | Brief of respondent hiQ Labs, Inc. in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jul 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
| |
Jul 16 2020 | Reply of petitioner LinkedIn Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021. |
| |
Jun 07 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioner LinkedIn Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 14 2021 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center GRANTED. |
| |
Jun 14 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Van Buren v. United States, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). |
| |
Jul 16 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |