Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1108
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1108
Title:DeRay Mckesson, Petitioner
v.
John Doe
Docketed:March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30864)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Brief of respondent Black Lives Matter Global Network, Inc. in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Amicus brief of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People not accepted for filing. (April 15, 2020)
Apr 09 2020Amicus brief of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People not accepted for filing. (April 15, 2020)
Apr 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Floyd Abrams, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Howard University Human and Civil Rights Clinic filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 09 2020Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent John Doe to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 11 2020Response Requested. (Due June 10, 2020)
May 29 2020Brief of respondent John Doe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 19 2020Reply of petitioner DeRay Mckesson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
109 South Fifth Street, Suite 4201
Brooklyn, NY 11249

david@donahuegoldberg.com
2123348813
Party name: DeRay Mckesson
Attorneys for Respondent
Donna Unkel Grodner
    Counsel of Record
Grodner & Associates
2223 Quail Run Drive
Suite B
Baton Rouge, LA 70808

dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com
2257691919
Party name: John Doe
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: Black Lives Matter Global Network, Inc.
Other
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

ebusby@law.utexas.edu
7139660409
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

adickerson@ifs.org
(202) 301-3300
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Justin David Hansford
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

Justin.Hansford@law.howard.edu
2027028538
Party name: Howard University Human and Civil Rights Clinic
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
Hope R. Metcalf
    Counsel of Record
Peter A. Gruber Rule of Law Clinic
127 Wall Street
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

hope.metcalf@yale.edu
203-432-9404
Party name: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
H. Jefferson Powell
    Counsel of Record
Duke Law School
Corner of Science & Towerview
Durham, NC 27708-0360

jefferson.powell01@gmail.com
9196137168
Party name: Floyd Abrams, Erwin Chemerinsky, Walter Dellinger, Geoffrey R. Stone, Nadine Strossen, and Kenneth P. White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543