Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1097
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1097
Title:Enzo Life Sciences, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Becton, Dickinson and Company, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1232, 2018-1233)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2020.
Mar 25 2020Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2020 to May 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2020.
May 06 2020Brief of respondent Becton, Dickinson And Company in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2020Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2020Reply of petitioner Enzo Life Sciences, Inc filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Desmarais LLP
230 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10169

jwilcox@desmaraisllp.com
212-351-3400
Party name: Enzo Life Sciences, Inc
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thomas.saunders@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6536
Party name: Becton, Dickinson And Company
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543