Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1093
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1093
Title:Aleashia Clarkston, et al., Petitioners
v.
John White
Docketed:March 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-31099)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2020Waiver of right of respondent John White to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Aleashia Clarkston, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
William David CoffeyLouisiana Department of Justice, AG's Office
1450 Poydras Street, Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70448

Coffeyd@ag.louisiana.gov
504-599-1202
Party name: John White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543