Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1074
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1074
Title:Celgene Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Laura A. Peter, Deputy Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:March 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1167, 2018-1168, 2018-1169, 2018-1171)
   Decision Date:July 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2020.
Mar 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2020Brief of respondent Laura A. Peter, Deputy Under secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2020Reply of petitioner Celgene Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 02 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3639
Party name: Celgene Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Peter, Laura A.
Other
Aaron Mark Frankel
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

afrankel@kramerlevin.com
2127157793
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543