Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1062
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1062
Title:CJ CheilJedang Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
International Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1590, 2018-1629)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Motion of respondents Ajinomoto Co., et al. to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Mar 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 11, 2020.
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2020 to May 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2020, for all respondents.
May 21 2020Brief of respondents International Trade Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 21 2020Brief of respondents Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition North America, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Reply of petitioners CJ CheilJedang Corp., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: CJ CheilJedang Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: International Trade Commission, et al.
John Dylane Livingstone
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
271 17th Street, NW, Suite 1400
Atlanta, GA 30363-6209

john.livingstone@finnegan.com
404-653-6449
Party name: Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition North America, Inc.
Charles Edmund LipseyFinnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
Two Freedom Square
11955 Freedom Drive
Reston, VA 20190-5675

charles.lipsey@finnegan.com
571-203-2700
Party name: Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition North America, Inc.
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543