Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1057
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1057
Title:Lori Rodriguez, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of San Jose, California, et al.
Docketed:February 25, 2020
Linked with 19A653
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17144)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2019Application (19A653) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 23, 2019 to February 21, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Application (19A653) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 21, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 20 2020Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2020)
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2020 to June 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 22, 2020.
May 20 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Gun Owners of California, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2020Brief of respondents City of San Jose, California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald E. J. Kilmer Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Donald Kilmer, APC
14085 Silver Ridge Road
Caldwell, ID 83607

don@dklawoffice.com
(408) 348-6068
Party name: Lori Rodriguez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew W. Pritchard
    Counsel of Record
City of San Jose, City Attorney's Office
200 East Santa Clara Street
16th Floor
San Jose, CA 95113

mwpritchard1321@gmail.com
775-762-8522
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.
Malgorzata LaskowskaOffice of City Attorney, City of San Jose
City of San Jose
200 East Santa Clara Street, 16th Floor
San Jose, CA 95113

margo.laskowska@sanjoseca.gov
408-535-1900
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.
Matthew PritchardOffice of the City Attorney, San Jose, CA
200 East Santa Clara Street
16th Floor Tower
San Jose, CA 95113-1905

matthew.pritchard@sanjoseca.gov
408-535-1900
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.
Other
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of California, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Heller Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543