Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1056
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1056
Title:Kristi Noem, Governor of South Dakota, et al., Petitioners
v.
Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Linked with 19A788
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1271)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 24, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2020Application (19A788) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Jan 14 2020Application (19A788) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 21, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Kristi Noem, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 25, 2020)
Feb 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2020.
Apr 20 2020Brief of respondent Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2020Reply of petitioners Kristi Noen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 26 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul S. Swedlund
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1
Pierre, SD 57501-8501

paul.swedlund@state.sd.us
6057735402
Party name: Kristi Noen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543