Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1039
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1039
Title:PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC, Petitioner
v.
New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:February 20, 2020
Linked with 19A836
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1191, 19-1232)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2020Application (19A836) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 3, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Application (19A836) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 4, 2020.
Feb 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Marcellus Shale Coalition and Pennsylvania Independent Oil & Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Industrial Energy Consumers of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Pennslvania Manufacturers' Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Waiver of New Jersey Conservation Foundation of right to respond not accepted for filing. (March 24, 2020)
Mar 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey Conservation Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Energy Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Energy Equipment and Infrastructure Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Gas Association, American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Waiver of right of respondents State of New Jersey; NJ Department of Envrionmental Protection, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 13 2020Response Requested. (Due May 13, 2020)
Apr 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2020 to June 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2020Response to motion from petitioner PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC filed.
Main Document
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including June 2, 2020, for all respondents.
Jun 02 2020Brief of respondents State of New Jersey; NJ Department of Envrionmental Protection, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey Conservation Foundation to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 09 2020Reply of petitioners PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Dec 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 23 2020Supplemental brief of respondents State of New Jersey; NJ Department of Envrionmental Protection, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 03 2021Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Did the Court of Appeals properly exercise jurisdiction over this case? The case will be set for argument in the April 2021 argument session.
Feb 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC
Blanket Consent
Feb 08 2021Joint motion to set the briefing schedule filed by the parties.
Main Document
Feb 10 2021Joint motion to set the briefing schedule GRANTED. Petitioner's brief on the merits will be filed on or before March 1, 2021. Respondents briefs on the merits will be filed on or before March 31, 2021. The reply brief will be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Feb 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, New Jersey Conservation Foundation
Blanket Consent
Mar 01 2021Brief of petitioner PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Joint appendix (two volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Mar 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of New Jersey; NJ Department of Envrionmental Protection, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Energy Equipment and Infrastructure Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Pennslvania Manufacturers' Association and the New Jersey Business & Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Gas Association, American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Marcellus Shale Coalition and Pennsylvania Independent Oil & Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 28, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief of respondent New Jersey Conservation Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief of respondents New Jersey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 31 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 07 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The Council of State Governments, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 16 2021Reply of petitioner PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2021Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Jeremy M. Feigenbaum, Counsel to the Attorney General, Trenton, N. J.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
P.O. Box 112
Trenton, NJ 08611

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
609-984-3900
Party name: New Jersey, et al.
Matthew Littleton
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

matt@donahuegoldberg.com
2026836895
Party name: New Jersey Conservation Foundation
Jennifer Lynn DanisMorningside Heights Legal Services
435 W. 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

jld2228@columbia.edu
12013063382
Party name: New Jersey Conservation Foundation
Edward LloydMorningside Heights Legal Services, Inc.
Columbia Law School
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

elloyd@law.columbia.edu
9734953774
Party name: New Jersey Conservation Foundation
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Charles Owen Beckley II
    Counsel of Record
Beckley & Madden, LLC
212 North Third Street, Suite 301
Harrisburg, PA 17101

cbeckley@pa.net
(717) 233-7691
Party name: Pennslvania Manufacturers' Association and the New Jersey Business & Industry Association
Ellen O. Boardman
    Counsel of Record
O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue LLP
5301 Wisconsin Ave, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20015

eboardman@odonoghuelaw.com
2023620041
Party name: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al.
Terry Robert Bossert
    Counsel of Record
Marcellus Shale Coalition
300 N. 2nd St.
Suite 1102
Harrisburg, PA 17101

tbossert@marcelluscoalition.org
717-603-0714
Party name: Marcellus Shale Coalition and Pennsylvania Independent Oil & Gas Association
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: State of Oregon, et al.
Lela M. Hollabaugh
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1600 Division Street
Nashville, TN 37203

lhollabaugh@bradley.com
615-252-2348
Party name: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Gas Association, American Petroleum Institute
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Energy Equipment and Infrastructure Alliance
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Hala A. Sandridge
    Counsel of Record
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
401 East Jackson Street
Suite 2400
Tampa, FL 33602

hala.sandridge@bipc.com
8132221127
Party name: Consumer Energy Alliance
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Vivek Vijay Tata
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Sixth Avenue
New York, NY 10104

vtata@selendygay.com
2123909058
Party name: The Council of State Governments, The National League of Cities, The U.S. Conference of Mayors, The International City/County Management Association, and The International Municipal Lawyers Association
Kenneth Von Schaumburg
    Counsel of Record
Clark Hill PLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004

kvonschaumburg@clarkhill.com
(202)403-9604
Party name: Industrial Energy Consumers of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543