Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1038
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1038
Vide 19-1040, 19-1053
Title:Department of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2020
Linked with 19A757
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15072, 19-15118, 19-15150)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2020Application (19A757) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2020 to February 19, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 08 2020Application (19A757) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 19, 2020.
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Waiver of right of respondent March for Life Education and Defense Fund to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Brief of respondents State of California, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home v. Pennsylvania, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).
Aug 10 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

oldSupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Health and Human Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: March for Life Education and Defense Fund
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: State of California
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543