Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1035
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1035
Title:ShaRon D. Rose, Petitioner
v.
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 20, 2020
Linked with 19A741
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50598)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2019Application (19A741) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 03 2020Application (19A741) denied by Justice Alito.
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 20 2020Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2020)
May 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2020 to June 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2020.
Jun 04 2020Brief of respondents Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Reply of petitioner ShaRon D. Rose filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: ShaRon D. Rose
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Michael D. ConnerHirsch & Westheimer
1415 Louisiana Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002

mconner@hirschwest.com
713-220-9162
Party name: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543