Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1021
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1021
Title:Micah Jessop, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Fresno, California, et al.
Docketed:February 18, 2020
Linked with 19A604
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16756)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2019Application (19A604) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Application (19A604) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2020Waiver of right of respondent City of Fresno, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 09 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New Civil Liberties Alliance.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 12 2020Response Requested. (Due April 13, 2020)
Mar 17 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Justice.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2020Response to motion of New Civil Liberties Alliance for leave to file as amicus curiae from respondent City of Fresno, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by DKT Liberty Project, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Brief of respondents City of Fresno, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Apr 28 2020Reply of petitioners Micah Jessop, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Justice GRANTED.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. GRANTED.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New Civil Liberties Alliance GRANTED.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers GRANTED.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center GRANTED.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by DKT Liberty Project, et al. GRANTED.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Micah Jessop, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel P. Barer
    Counsel of Record
Pollak, Vida and Barer
11500 West Olympic Blvd
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

daniel@pollakvida.com
3105513400
Party name: City of Fresno, et al.
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project, Reason Foundation, Individual Rights Foundation, Law Enforcement Action Partnership, Restore the Fourth, Inc.
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
Two Palo Alto Square
Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94306

dfalk@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2030
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Harriet M. Hageman
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

harriet.hageman@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute and Americans for Prosperity Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543