Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1019
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1019
Vide 19-840
Title:Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:February 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10011)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2020Letter of February 18, 2020 from counsel for respondent U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Letter of February 19, 2020 from counsel for respondent State of California filed.
Main Document
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-840 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Mar 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-840. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-840. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 10, 2020. VIDED.
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED
Sep 10 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Nov 10 2020Argued. For California, et al.: Michael J. Mongan, Solicitor General, San Francisco, Cal. For U.S. House of Representatives: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D. C. For Texas, et al.: Kyle D. Hawkins, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex. For United States, et al.: Jeffrey B. Wall, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515-6532

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6269
Party name: State of California
Other
Nicole G. Berner
    Counsel of Record
Service Employees International Union
1800 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

nicole.berner@seiu.org
2027307000
Party name: Service Employees International Union, et al.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: HCA Healthcare, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543