Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1011
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1011
Title:Eric F. Kelly, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 13, 2020
Linked with 19A645
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0156/AR)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2019Application (19A645) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 15, 2019 to February 13, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Application (19A645) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 13, 2020.
Feb 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary D Spilman
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Zachary Spilman
29 North Main Street #97
Sherborn, MA 01770

zack@zacharyspilman.com
844-774-5626
Party name: Eric F. Kelly
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543