Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-101
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-101
Title:Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al.
Docketed:July 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2107, 2017-2133)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Waiver of right of respondents Samsung Electronics Co., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 19 2019Brief amici curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Technology Industry Leaders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: IMPERIUM IP HOLDINGS (CAYMAN), LTD.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. and SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.,
Other
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: TECHNOLOGY INDUSTRY LEADERS
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: US Inventor, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543