Docket for 19-1006
 | |
|
Nov 26 2019 | Application (19A609) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2019 to February 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 02 2019 | Application (19A609) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 8, 2020. | | | Feb 07 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2020. | | | Apr 09 2020 | Brief of respondents Lee Sullivan in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 27 2020 | Reply of petitioners Facebook, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 28 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|