Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A937
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A937
Title:Marie Laventure, et al., Applicants
v.
United Nations, et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2019
Linked with 18-1427
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2908)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2019Application (18A937) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Application (18A937) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 13, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James F. Haggerty45 Broadway, Suite 3140
New York, NY 10006

(212) 480-0700
Party name: Marie Laventure, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United Nations, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543