Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A815 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A815 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Applicant
v.
Domineque Hakim Marcelle Ray
Docketed:February 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10405-P)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2018Amended application to vacate stay of execution filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Application (18A815) to vacate stay of execution, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2019Application (18A815) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2019Application (18A815) granted by the Court. The application to vacate the stay of execution of sentence of death entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit on February 6, 2019, presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court, is granted. On November 6, 2018, the State scheduled Domineque Ray’s execution date for February 7, 2019. Because Ray waited until January 28, 2019 to seek relief, we grant the State’s application to vacate the stay entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. See Gomez v. United States Dist. Court for Northern Dist. of Cal., 503 U. S. 653, 654 (1992) (per curiam) (“A court may consider the last-minute nature of an application to stay execution in deciding whether to grant equitable relief.”). Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, and Justice Sotomayor join, dissenting from grant of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion)
Feb 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief and to file brief on 8.5 x 11 paper submitted by the Rutherford Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2019Response to application from respondent Domineque Hakim Marcelle Ray filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Reply of applicant Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections filed.
Reply

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Dearman Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

randerson@ago.state.al.us
3343532021
Party name: Commissioner
Attorneys for Respondent
John Anthony Palombi
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders
817 South Court Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

John_Palombi@fd.org
334-834-2099
Party name: Domineque Hakim Marcelle Ray
Other
Anand Agneshwar
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 W. 55th St.
New York, NY 10019

Anand.Agneshwar@arnoldporter.com
2128368011
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543