Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A774
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A774
Title:June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al., Applicants
v.
Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Docketed:January 28, 2019
Linked with 18-1323
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30397)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019Application (18A774) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 29 2019Response to application (18A774) requested by Justice Alito, due Thursday, January 31, 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
Jan 31 2019Response to application from respondent Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2019Reply of applicants June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Because the filings regarding the application for a stay in this matter were not completed until earlier today and the Justices need time to review these filings, the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, case No. 17-30397, is administratively stayed through Thursday, February 7, 2019. This order does not reflect any view regarding the merits of the petition for a writ of certiorari that applicants represent they will file.
Feb 07 2019Application (18A774) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2019Application (18A774) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to JUSTICE ALITO and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in case No. 17-30397 is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. JUSTICE THOMAS, JUSTICE ALITO, JUSTICE GORSUCH, and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH would deny the application. JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, dissenting from grant of application for stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julie RikelmanCenter for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

jrikelman@reprorights.org
917-637-3670
Party name: June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Dr. Rebekah Gee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543