Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A669
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A669
Title:In Re Grand Jury Subpoena, Applicant
Docketed:December 22, 2018
Linked with 18-948
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3071)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2018Application (18A669) for a stay and application for leave to file the application under seal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 23 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the order of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia holding the applicant in contempt, including the accrual of monetary penalties, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Monday, December 31, 2018, by noon, and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court.
Dec 28 2018Response to application and application for leave to file the response under seal filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019Reply of applicant and application for leave to file the reply under seal filed.
Reply
Jan 08 2019Application (18A669) referred to the Court.
Jan 08 2019Application (18A669) denied by the Court. The administrative stay previously entered by The Chief Justice is vacated.
Jan 09 2019Motion of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press for leave to intervene to file a motion to unseal.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019The applications for leave to file the application for stay, the response, and the reply under seal presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court are granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian D. BooneAlston & Bird LLP
101 N. Tryon Street
Suite 4000
Charlotte, NC 28280

brian.boone@alston.com
7044441000
Party name: Petitioner
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543