Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A65
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A65
Title:United States, et al., Applicants
v.
United States District Court for the District of Oregon
Docketed:July 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-71928)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2018Application (18A65) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 18 2018Response to application (18A65) requested by Justice Kennedy, due Monday, July 23, by noon ET.
Jul 23 2018Letter of applicants United States, et al. received.
Jul 23 2018Response to application from respondents Kelsey Cascadia Rose Juliana, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2018Reply of applicants United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 30 2018Application (18A65) referred to the Court.
Jul 30 2018Application (18A65) denied by the Court. The Government’s request for relief is premature and is denied without prejudice. The breadth of respondents’ claims is striking, however, and the justiciability of those claims presents substantial grounds for difference of opinion. The District Court should take these concerns into account in assessing the burdens of discovery and trial, as well as the desirability of a prompt ruling on the Government’s pending dispositive motions.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: USA, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Julia Ann Olson
    Counsel of Record
Wild Earth Advocates
1216 Lincoln Street
Eugene, OR 97401

juliaaolson@gmail.com
415 786 4825
Party name: Kelsey Cascadia Rose Juliana, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543