Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A615
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A615
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Applicants
v.
East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17274)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2018Application (18A615) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Proof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsMain Document
Dec 11 2018Response to application (18A615) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, December 17, 2018, by noon.
Dec 14 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Dec 17 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Peter Keisler, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 17 2018Response to application from respondents East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al. filed.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Reply of applicant Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Reply
Dec 20 2018Letter of applicant Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., with attached copy of the district court's December 19, 2018 order, filed.
Reply
Dec 21 2018Application (18A615) referred to the Court.
Dec 21 2018Application (18A615) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, Justice Gorsuch, and Justice Kavanaugh would grant the application for stay.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
2125492616
Party name: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, et al.
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
202-303-1108
Party name: Peter Keisler, Stuart Gerson, William Webster, Carter Phillips, John Bellinger III, Samuel Witten, Ray LaHood, Christopher Shays, Christine Todd Whitman, Brackett Denniston, Stanley Twardy, and Richard Bernstein

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543