Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A598
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A598
Title:Georgia, et al., Applicants
v.
Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Docketed:December 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11589)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Application (18A598) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 4, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Stephen Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037

joshjohnson@velaw.com
2026396623
Party name: Georgia, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543