Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A452
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A452
Title:Robert Stevens, et al., Applicants
v.
CoreLogic, Inc.
Docketed:October 29, 2018
Linked with 18-878
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56098)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2018Application (18A452) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2018 to January 3, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
OtherMain DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Application (18A452) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 3, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joel Benjamin Rothman
    Counsel of Record
Schneider Rothman Intellectual Property Law Group PLLC
4651 N. Federal Hwy
Boca Raton, FL 33431

joel.rothman@sriplaw.com
5614044335
Party name: Stevens, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543