Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A417
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A417
Title:Google LLC, Applicant
v.
Oracle America, Inc.
Docketed:October 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1118, 2017-1202)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2018Application (18A417) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Application (18A417) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Google LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543