Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A412
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A412
Title:Frederick L. Allen, et al., Applicants
v.
Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:October 18, 2018
Linked with 18-877
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1522, 17-1602)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2018Application (18A412) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2018 to January 6, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Application (18A412) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 6, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
777 6th Street, NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20004

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Frederick L. Allen, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543