Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A380 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A380 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Floyd Daniel Smith, Applicant
v.
California
Docketed:October 10, 2018
Linked with 18-7094
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S065233)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2018Application (18A380) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 16, 2018 to December 15, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Application (18A380) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 15, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elias Paul Batchelder
    Counsel of Record
Office of the State Public Defender
1111 Broadway, 10th Floor
Oakland, CA 94131

elias.batchelder@ospd.ca.gov
5102673330
Party name: Floyd Smith

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543