Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A335
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A335
Title:Richard Brakebill, et al., Applicants
v.
Alvin Jaeger, North Dakota Secretary of State
Docketed:September 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1725)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2018Application (18A335) to vacate stay of preliminary injunction, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Response to application (18A335) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due Tuesday, October 2, by 5 p.m. ET.
Oct 02 2018Response to application from respondent Alvin Jaeger, North Dakota Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Reply of applicant Richard Brakebill, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Oct 09 2018Application (18A335) referred to the Court.
Oct 09 2018Application (18A335) denied by the Court. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this application. Justice Ginsburg, with whom Justice Kagan joins, dissents. (Detached opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Ernest Echohawk
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1506 Broadway
Boulder, CO 80302

jechohwk@narf.org
303-447-8760
Party name: Richard Brakebill, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Alvin Jaeger

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543