Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A174
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A174
Title:Congregation Jeshuat Israel, Applicant
v.
Congregation Shearith Israel
Docketed:August 16, 2018
Linked with 18-530
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1756)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Application (18A174) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 5, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Application (18A174) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary Philip Naftalis
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gnaftalis@KRAMERLEVIN.com
212-715-9100
Party name: Congregation Jeshuat Israel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543