Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A15
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A15
Title:Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Applicant
v.
Erik Brunetti
Docketed:June 29, 2018
Linked with 18-302
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1109)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2018Application (18A15) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 10, 2018.
Jul 31 2018Application (18A15) to extend further the time from August 10, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 7, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543