Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A146
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A146
Title:Food Marketing Institute, Applicant
v.
Argus Leader Media, dba Argus Leader
Docketed:August 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1346)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2018Application (18A146) to recall and stay mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 09 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, case No. 17-1346, is hereby recalled and stayed pending further order of the undersigned or of the Court. It is further ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Thursday, August 16, 2018, by 4 p.m. The reply, if any, is to be filed by 4 p.m., Tuesday, August 21, 2018.
Aug 16 2018Response to application from respondent Argus Leader Media, D/B/A Argus Leader filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Reply of applicant Food Marketing Institute filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Aug 29 2018Application (18A146) referred to the Court.
Aug 29 2018Application (18A146) granted by the Court. The application to recall and stay the mandate, presented to Justice Gorsuch and by him referred to the Court, is granted, and the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit in case No. 17-1346 is recalled and stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gavin Robert Villareal
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

gavin.villareal@bakerbotts.com
512-322-2652
Party name: Food Marketing Institute
Attorneys for Respondent
N. Dean Nasser Jr.
    Counsel of Record
204 South Main Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104

dean@nasserlaw.com
6053350001
Party name: Argus Leader Media, D/B/A Argus Leader

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543