Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1257
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1257
Title:United States, Applicant
v.
Richard D. Collins
Docketed:June 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(031219)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2019Application (18A1257) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2019 to July 10, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 06 2019Application (18A1257) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 10, 2019.
Jun 28 2019Application (18A1257) to extend further the time from July 10, 2019 to August 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Application (18A1257) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 9, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543