Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1238 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1238 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Christopher Lee Price, Applicant
v.
Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:May 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-12026)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2019Application (18A1238) for a stay of execution of sentence of death and for leave to file the application under seal with redacted copies for the public record, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
May 30 2019Response to application and application for leave to file the response under seal with redacted copies for the public record from respondent Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. filed.
Main Document
May 30 2019Application (18A1238) referred to the Court.
May 30 2019Application (18A1238) denied by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to JUSTICE THOMAS and by him referred to the Court is denied. The applications for leave to file the application for stay and the response under seal with redacted copies for the public record are granted. JUSTICE BREYER, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG joins, and with whom JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR and JUSTICE KAGAN join as to all but Part II, dissenting from denial of application for stay. (Detached Opinion)
Jun 07 2019Motion of National Public Radio, Inc., et al. for leave to intervene to file a motion to unseal filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 17 2019Response to motion to unseal from respondents Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Dept of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 24 2019Motion of National Public Radio, Inc., et al. for leave to intervene to file a motion to unseal GRANTED.
Jun 24 2019Motion of National Public Radio, Inc., et al. to unseal filed.
Jun 24 2019Motion of National Public Radio, Inc., et al. to unseal GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Michael Katz
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02199

aaron.katz@ropesgray.com
617-951-7117
Party name: Price, Christopher Lee
Attorneys for Respondents
Lauren Ashley Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

lsimpson@ago.state.al.us
3343531209
Party name: Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Dept of Corrections, et al
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
1156 15th St NW, Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: National Public Radio, Inc. and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543