Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1211
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1211
Title:Karolyn Givens, et al., Applicants
v.
Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Docketed:May 22, 2019
Linked with 19-54
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1159)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Application (18A1211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2019 to July 3, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1211) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 3, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher Stephen Johns
    Counsel of Record
Johns & Counsel PLLC
14101 Highway 290 West, Suite 400A
Austin, TX 78737

cjohns@johnsandcounsel.com
5123993150
Party name: Karolyn Givens, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543