Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1185
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1185
Title:Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al., Applicants
v.
Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estates of Victoria Soto, et al.
Docketed:May 16, 2019
Linked with 19-168
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(SC 19832, SC 19833)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2019Application (18A1185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2019 to August 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2019Application (18A1185) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 1, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
2026396518
Party name: Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543