Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1170
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1170
Title:Michigan Senate, et al., Applicants
v.
League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al.
Docketed:May 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(2:17-cv-14148)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2019Application (18A1170) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther
May 13 2019Response to application (18A1170) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Monday, May 20 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
May 20 2019Response to application from respondent Michigan Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2019Response of League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. to application not accepted for filing. (May 20, 2019)
May 20 2019Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2019Reply of applicants Michigan Senate, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1170) referred to the Court.
May 24 2019Application (18A1170) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, case No. 2:17-CV-14148, entered April 25, 2019, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court or further order of this Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-679-5257
Party name: Michigan Senate and Senators
Gary P. GordonDykema Gossett, PLLC
201 Townsend Street
Suite 900
Lansing, MI 48933

ggordon@dykema.com
517-374-9133
Party name: Michigan Senate and Senators
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph H. Yeager Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels, LLP
300 North Meridian Street
Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN 46204

jay.yeager@faegrebd.com
3172371278
Party name: League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al.
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Michigan Secretary of State

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543