Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1165
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1165
Title:Larry Householder, et al., Applicants
v.
Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Docketed:May 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(1:18-cv-357)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2019Application (18A1165) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 13 2019Response to application (18A1165) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Monday, May 20 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
May 20 2019Response to application from respondents Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2019Reply of applicants Larry Householder, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1165) referred to the Court.
May 24 2019Application (18A1165) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, case No. 1:18-CV-00357, entered May 3, 2019, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court or further order of this Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Larry Householder, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tiffany Alora Thomas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

athomas@aclu.org
212-519-7866
Party name: Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543