Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-999
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-999
Title:Atlanta Gas Light Company, Petitioner
v.
Bennett Regulator Guards, Inc.
Docketed:January 31, 2019
Linked with 18A637
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1555, 2017-1626)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2018Application (18A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2018 to January 28, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Application (18A637) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 28, 2019.
Jan 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019.
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019.
May 08 2019Brief of respondent Bennett Regulator Guards, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
May 28 2019Reply of petitioner Atlanta Gas Light Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Atlanta Gas Light Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Bennett Regulator Guards, Inc.
Other
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Intel Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543