Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-984
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-984
Title:King Mountain Tobacco Company, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-36055, 16-35607)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2018
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2019)
PetitionPetitionPetitionPetition
Feb 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019.
Mar 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2019.
May 01 2019Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2019Reply of petitioner King Mountain Tobacco Company, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher G. Browning Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
305 Church at North Hills Street
Suite 1200
Raleigh, NC 27609

chris.browning@troutmansanders.com
(919) 835-4127
Party name: King Mountain Tobacco Company, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543