Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-976
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-976
Title:Association of American Railroads, Petitioner
v.
Department of Transportation, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5123)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2019.
Feb 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2019 to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 26, 2019.
Apr 26 2019Brief of respondents Department of Transportation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2019Reply of petitioner Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Association of American Railroads
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Transportation, et al.
Other
C. Frederick Beckner III
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rbeckner@sidley.com
202-736-8874
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543