Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-970
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-970
Title:Thomas Mitchell, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tulalip Tribes of Washington
Docketed:January 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-35959)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Waiver of right of respondent Tulalip Tribes of Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 05 2019Response Requested. (Due April 4, 2019)
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Response to motion from petitioner Thomas Mitchell, et al. filed.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Letter in response to petitioner’s March 21, 2019 letter received.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Letter in response to respondent's March 21, 2019 letter from petitioner Thomas Mitchell, et al. received.
Main Document
May 06 2019Brief of respondent Tulalip Tribes of Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 23 2019Reply of petitioners Thomas Mitchell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Wright Smith
    Counsel of Record
Smith Goodfriend, P.S.
1619 8th Ave N
Seattle, WA 98109

cate@washingtonappeals.com
2066240974
Party name: Thomas Mitchell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Tulalip Tribes of Washington

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543