Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9639
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9639
Title:Dustin E. Ash, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3223, 17-3245)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 12, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Jun 19 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2019.
Aug 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 4, 2019.
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Reply of petitioner Dustin Ash filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Tyler Hansmeier
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office for the District of Kansas
500 State Avenue
Suite 201
Kansas City, KS 66101

daniel_hansmeier@fd.org
913-551-6712
Party name: Dustin Ash
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543