Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-96
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-96
Title:Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association, Petitioner
v.
Zackary W. Blair, Interim Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2018
Linked with 17A1186
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5552)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2018Application (17A1186) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2018 to July 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Apr 26 2018Application (17A1186) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 21, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Waiver of right of respondent Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 16 2018Brief of respondent Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent Affluere Investments, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition GRANTED.
Oct 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association.
Blanket Consent
Oct 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More.
Blanket Consent
Oct 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Affluere Investments, Inc..
Blanket Consent
Oct 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2018Brief of petitioner Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 13 2018Letter of respondent Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Amicus brief of KHBC PARTNERS II, LTD. not accepted for filing. (November 20, 2018 - Corrected version submitted)
Nov 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Beer and Wine Wholesalers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of KHBC Partners II, Ltd. filed. (11/16/2018)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of Tennessee, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of Open Markets Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of Consumer Action submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of NATIONAL BEER WHOLESALERS ASSOCIATION submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF STATE LEGISLATURES, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of Major Brands, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of American Beverage Licensees submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of Illinois, 34 States, and the District of Columbia submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of U.S. Alcohol Policy Alliance, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of National Alcohol Beverage Control Association, National Liquor Law Enforcement Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Amicus brief of Center for Alcohol Policy submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Eugene Bindas
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

mbindas@ij.org
2069571300
Party name: Affluere Investments, Inc.
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More
Joseph F. Whalen III
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

joe.whalen@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3499
Party name: Zackary W. Blair, Interim Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission
Sarah Keeton CampbellSpecial Assistant to the Solicitor General and the Attorney General
War Memorial Building
301 6th Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Zackary W. Blair, Interim Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission
William James MurphyZuckerman Spaeder LLP
100 East Pratt Street
Suite 2440
Baltimore, MD 21202

wmurphy@zuckerman.com
410-332-0444
Party name: Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More
Other
David A. Balto
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of David Balto
1325 G Street, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

david.balto@dcantitrustlaw.com
2025775424
Party name: Consumer Action
Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

rachel@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: National Alcohol Beverage Control Association, National Liquor Law Enforcement Association
John Laughlin Carter
    Counsel of Record
Carter Hayes LLC
4115 Annandale Road
Suite 205
Annandale, VA 20036

jlaughlinc@gmail.com
7036587737
Party name: Open Markets Institute
Allison L. Ehlert
    Counsel of Record
Ehlert Appeals
P.O. Box 1024
El Cerrito, CA 94530

allison@ehlertappeals.com
415-828-5350
Party name: U.S. Alcohol Policy Alliance, et al.
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of America, Inc.
David Leigh Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Illinois
100 W. Randolph
12th floor
Chicago, IL 60601

dfranklin@atg.state.il.us
3128145376
Party name: Illinois, 34 States, and the District of Columbia
Harry Arthur Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Herzog & Carp
427 Mason Park Blvd.
Katy, TX 77450

hherzog@hcmlegal.com
7137817500
Party name: KHBC PARTNERS II, LTD.
Henry Edward Hildebrand III
    Counsel of Record
150 Fourth Avenue, North
Suite 1820
Nashville, TN 37219

hhildebrand@fpwlegal.com
615-810-8777
Party name: Wine and Spirits Wholesalers of Tennessee, Inc.
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397700
Party name: American Beverage Licensees
Anthony S. Kogut
    Counsel of Record
Willingham & Cote
333 Albert Ave.
Suite 500
East Lansing, MI 48823

akogut@willinghamcote.com
517-351-6200
Party name: Michigan Beer and Wine Wholesalers Association
Michael D. Madigan
    Counsel of Record
Madigan, Dahln & Harlan, P.A.
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 3150
Minneapolis, MN 55402

madigan@mdh-law.com
612-604-2000
Party name: NATIONAL BEER WHOLESALERS ASSOCIATION
John Cowles Neiman Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
1901 Sixth Avenue North
2400 Regions/Harbert Plaza
Birmingham, AL 35203

jneiman@maynardcooper.com
2052541228
Party name: Center for Alcohol Policy
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wileyrein.com
202-719-7314
Party name: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF STATE LEGISLATURES, et al.
Richard B. Walsh Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Suite 2500
600 Washington Ave.
St. Louis, MO 63101

rwalsh@lewisrice.com
314-444-7600
Party name: Major Brands, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543