Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9554 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9554 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:In Re Billie J. Allen, Petitioner
Docketed:June 5, 2019
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2019 to August 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 4, 2019.
Aug 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 4, 2019.
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 12, 2019.
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 12, 2019 to January 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 13, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Feb 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2020 to March 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 26, 2020.
Mar 26 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 03 2020Reply of petitioner Billie J. Allen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED.
May 19 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Billie Jerome Allen#26901-044
P.O. Box 33
Terre Haute, IN 47808

Party name: In Re: Billie J. Allen
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543