Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9532
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9532
Title:Lemuel Clayton Bray, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-8051)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 28 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until October 28, 2019, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Oct 18 2019Petitioner complied with order of October 7, 2019.
Oct 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lemuel Clayton Bray2833 Main St.
Torrington, WY 82240

(307) 316-8568
Party name: Lemuel C. Bray
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543